Williams v. City of Munford, Tennessee et al
Plaintiff: Calvin L. Williams, Jr.
Defendant: City of Munford, Tennessee, Randal Baskin, James Taube, Christopher Yount, Burt Zickefoose and Daniel Hamm
Case Number: 2:2021cv02676
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. McKenney, Jr on behalf of Randal Baskin (McKenney, Edward)
December 22, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Randal Baskin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(Wyatt, William)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Defendant Daniel Hamm's Motion for Extension of Time. Daniel Hamm answer due 1/14/2022. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/16/21. (shl)
December 15, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (proposed order submitted) by Daniel Hamm. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Extension, #2 Certificate of Consultation)
December 15, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan E. Arthur on behalf of Calvin L. Williams, Jr (Arthur, Megan)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Defendant Randal Baskin's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Randal Baskin answer due 12/22/2021. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/15/21. (shl)
December 14, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Accompanying Memorandum of Law, proposed order submitted by Randal Baskin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Consultation)(Wyatt, William)
December 14, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Burns on behalf of Daniel Hamm (Burns, Robert)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #19 #21 Defendants James Taube and Defendant Burt Zickefoose's Motions for Extension of Time. Burt Zickefoose answer due 1/14/2022; James Taube answer due 1/14/2022. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/14/21. (shl)
December 14, 2021 Filing 22 Certificate of Consultation by Burt Zickefoose. (Berexa, Kristin)
December 14, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, proposed order submitted by Burt Zickefoose. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Berexa, Kristin)
December 14, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin E. Berexa on behalf of Burt Zickefoose (Berexa, Kristin)
December 14, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, proposed order submitted by James Taube. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintif's Complaint, #2 Certificate of Consultation in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Hill, Michael)
December 14, 2021 Filing 18 SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling Conference has been set for Tuesday, January 18, 2022 at 1:30 P.M. via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (smm)
December 13, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Hill on behalf of James Taube (Hill, Michael)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #15 Defendant Christopher Yount's Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/13/21. (shl) (Main Document 16 replaced on 12/16/2021) (shl).
December 13, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer proposed Order submitted by Christopher Yount. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Extension of Time, #2 Certificate of Consultation)(Burleson, John)
December 13, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Robert Courtner on behalf of Christopher Yount (Courtner, Matthew)
December 13, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Burleson on behalf of Christopher Yount (Burleson, John)
December 9, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Calvin L. Williams, Jr as to Randal Baskin. (Cochran, William)
December 9, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Calvin L. Williams, Jr as to James Taube. (Cochran, William)
December 9, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Calvin L. Williams, Jr as to Daniel Hamm. (Cochran, William)
December 9, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Calvin L. Williams, Jr as to City of Munford, Tennessee. (Cochran, William)
December 9, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Calvin L. Williams, Jr as to Christopher Yount. (Cochran, William)
December 9, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Calvin L. Williams, Jr as to Burt Zickefoose. (Cochran, William)
October 27, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Randal Baskin, City of Munford, Tennessee, Daniel Hamm, James Taube, Christopher Yount, Burt Zickefoose. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Randal Baskin, #2 James Taube, #3 Christopher Yount, #4 Burt Zickefoose, #5 Daniel Hamm)(agj)
October 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
October 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
October 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
October 27, 2021 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (agj)
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Calvin L. Williams, Jr (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3734699), filed by Calvin L. Williams, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for City of Munford, #3 Summons for Randal Baskin, #4 Summons for James Taube, #5 Summons for Christopher Yount, #6 Summons for Burt Zickefoose, #7 Summons for Daniel Hamm)(Cochran, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. City of Munford, Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin L. Williams, Jr.
Represented By: William E. Cochran, Jr.
Represented By: Megan E. Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Munford, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randal Baskin
Represented By: Edward J. McKenney, Jr.
Represented By: William J. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Taube
Represented By: Michael R. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Yount
Represented By: John D. Burleson
Represented By: Matthew Robert Courtner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burt Zickefoose
Represented By: Kristin E. Berexa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Hamm
Represented By: Robert M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?