Houston v. People Ready, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rita Houston
Defendant: People Ready, Inc. and Catamount Constructors, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2021cv02684
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 12/03/2021. Defendant Catamount Constructors, Inc.'s answer is due on 12/31/2021. (Mays, Samuel)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Response to Complaint, proposed order submitted by Catamount Constructors, Inc.. (Lew, Isaac)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rita Houston as to Catamount Constructors, Inc.. (Fishman, Randall)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Catamount Constructors, Inc.. (Lew, Isaac)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin O'Neal Baskette on behalf of Catamount Constructors, Inc. (Baskette, Kevin)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 11/05/2021. Defendant Catamount Constructors, Inc.'s response is due 12/6/2021. (Mays, Samuel)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Response to Complaint, proposed order submitted by Catamount Constructors, Inc.. (Lew, Isaac)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (btg)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (btg)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (btg)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (btg)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Catamount Constructors, Inc. from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-3704-21 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3738037), filed by Catamount Constructors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint in Shelby County Circuit Court, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lew, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston v. People Ready, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Houston
Represented By: Randall J. Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People Ready, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catamount Constructors, Inc.
Represented By: Isaac Salomon Lew
Represented By: Kevin O'Neal Baskette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?