Anderson v. Laurenzi
Petitioner: Elvis Anderson
Respondent: Eugene Laurenzi
Case Number: 2:2021cv02692
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Mark S Norris
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 8 Letter from Elvis Anderson (Attachments: #1 envelope) (btg)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE AN IN FORMA PAUPERIS AFFIDAVIT AND TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT OR PAY THE HABEAS CORPUS FILING FEE. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 12/15/2021. (Norris, Mark)
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 PRO SE MOTION to Transfer; Judgment(s) by Elvis Anderson. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(btg)
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 PRO SE MOTION to Correct Error re #3 Order by Elvis Anderson. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(btg)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 Letter from Elvis Anderson addressed to Judge Norris. (Attachments: #1 envelope) (btg)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE AN IN FORMA PAUPERIS AFFIDAVIT AND TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT OR PAY THE HABEAS CORPUS FILING FEE. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 11/4/2021. (Norris, Mark)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under28 U.S.C. 2241 filed by Elvis Anderson against Eugene Laurenzi. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Laurenzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Elvis Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eugene Laurenzi
Represented By: 2241 AUSA - Memphis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?