Thornton v. Childress
Petitioner: Joel Terrence Thornton
Respondent: R. M. Childress
Case Number: 2:2021cv02697
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: John T Fowlkes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from Joel Thornton (Attachments: #1 envelope) (jae)
December 8, 2021 Filing 5 ATTACHMENT to #1 Pro Se Complaint, by Joel Terrence Thornton. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
November 24, 2021 Filing 4 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joel Terrence Thornton. (Attachments: #1 Errata, #2 envelope)(jae)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING Petitioner To File an In Forma Pauperis Affidavit and Trust Fund Account Statement or Pay the Habeas Corpus Filing Fee signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 11/8/2021. (Fowlkes, J.)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 filed by Joel Terrence Thornton against R. M. Childress. (Attachments: #1 Psych Services, #2 Attempt at Informal Resolution, #3 Statement, #4 Ref to payment, #5 Envelope, #6 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thornton v. Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joel Terrence Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. M. Childress
Represented By: 2241 AUSA - Memphis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?