Todd v. Fay Servicing et al
Plaintiff: John Robert Todd
Defendant: Fay Servicing, Rushmore Loan Management Services and Community Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv02704
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Filing 11 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 01/05/2022. (shl)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 01/04/2022. (shl)
December 1, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Fay Servicing. (Wright, Heather)
December 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Fay Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Note, #2 Exhibit Deed of Trust, #3 Exhibit April 2013 Assignment, #4 Exhibit June 2021 Assignment, #5 Exhibit Notice of Servicing Transfer)(Wright, Heather)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #2 AND DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/12/2021. (shl)
November 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (csf)
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (csf)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE: Signed agreement to receive notice of electronic filing (NEF) by John Robert Todd (csf)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Robert Todd. (csf)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT and Request for Injunction filed by John Robert Todd against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todd v. Fay Servicing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Robert Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay Servicing
Represented By: Heather Howell Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushmore Loan Management Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?