Transport Financial Services, LLC v. Standridge Logistics & Consulting, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Transport Financial Services, LLC
Defendant: Standridge Logistics & Consulting, LLC, Taimen Transport, LLC, Try Hours Logistics, LLC, Clark Freight Lines, Inc., Bolt Express, LLC, TA Services, Inc. and Baxter Bailey & Associates
Case Number: 2:2022cv02063
Filed: February 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2022 Filing 37 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 3/24/2022. (mab)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING #35 Motion for Interpleader Disbursement (28 U.S.C. Section 1335). Authorized deposit in the amount of $75000.00. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 3/24/2022. (mab)
March 24, 2022 Filing 35 Joint MOTION for Interpleader Disbursement (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) (proposed Order submitted) by Transport Financial Services, LLC. (Seaton, Henry)
March 23, 2022 Filing 34 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Transport Financial Services, LLC against Clark Freight Lines, Inc., Standridge Logistics & Consulting, LLC, Try Hours Logistics, LLC. Signed by Clerk of Court on 3/23/2022. (jae)
March 23, 2022 Filing 33 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Standridge Logistics & Consulting, LLC, Clark Freight Lines, Inc., and Try Hours Logistics, LLC (proposed order submitted) by Transport Financial Services, LLC. (Seaton, Henry)
March 15, 2022 Filing 32 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Try Hours Logistics, LLC. Motion terminated: #31 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Try Hours Logistics, LLC (Proposed Order submitted) filed by Transport Financial Services, LLC. (jae)
March 14, 2022 Filing 31 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Try Hours Logistics, LLC (Proposed Order submitted) by Transport Financial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-Affidavit of Henry E. Seaton)(Seaton, Henry)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING #24 Motion to Substitute Party. TA Services, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 3/11/2022. (mab)
March 10, 2022 Filing 29 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Clark Freight Lines, Inc., Standridge Logistics & Consulting, LLC. (btg)
March 9, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Strandridge Logistics & Consulting, LLC (proposed order submitted) by Transport Financial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-Affidavit of Henry E. Seaton)(Seaton, Henry)
March 9, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Clark Freight Lines, Inc. by Transport Financial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-Affidavit of Henry E. Seaton)(Seaton, Henry)
March 1, 2022 Filing 26 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference has been set for Tuesday, 4/5/2022 at 2:00 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
March 1, 2022 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint on behalf of TA Services, Inc. by Baxter Bailey & Associates.(Davison, Travis)
February 28, 2022 Filing 24 Consent MOTION to Substitute Party by Baxter Bailey & Associates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Assignment, #2 Certificate of Consultation)(Davison, Travis)
February 23, 2022 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Transport Financial Services, LLC as to Clark Freight Lines, Inc.. (Seaton, Henry)
February 23, 2022 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Transport Financial Services, LLC as to Try Hours Logistics, LLC. (Seaton, Henry)
February 22, 2022 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Transport Financial Services, LLC as to TA Services, Inc.. (Seaton, Henry)
February 22, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Transport Financial Services, LLC as to Standridge Logistics & Consulting, LLC. (Seaton, Henry)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 2/16/2022. (mab)
February 16, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Baxter Bailey & Associates.(Davison, Travis)
February 16, 2022 Filing 17 Consent MOTION to Substitute Party by Baxter Bailey & Associates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Assignments, #2 Certificate of Consultation)(Davison, Travis)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion to Deposit Funds. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 2/15/2022. (mab)
February 15, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Deposit Funds (proposed Order submitted) by Transport Financial Services, LLC. (Seaton, Henry)
February 15, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Edgar Davison, III on behalf of Baxter Bailey & Associates (Davison, Travis)
February 14, 2022 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Clark Freight Lines, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
February 14, 2022 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Try Hours Logistics, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Main Document 12 replaced on 2/14/2022) (jae).
February 14, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Summons by Henry Edward Seaton on behalf of Transport Financial Services, LLC. (Seaton, Henry)
February 11, 2022 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to TA Services, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
February 11, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Summons by Henry Edward Seaton on behalf of Transport Financial Services, LLC. (Seaton, Henry)
February 9, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Transport Financial Services, LLC. Taimen Transport, LLC waiver sent on 2/7/2022, answer due 4/8/2022. (Seaton, Henry)
February 9, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Standridge Logistics & Consulting, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
February 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Summons by Henry Edward Seaton on behalf of Transport Financial Services, LLC. (Seaton, Henry)
February 7, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
February 7, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
February 7, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jae)
February 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER AND POSTING OF COLLATERAL against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3802141), filed by Transport Financial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seaton, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Transport Financial Services, LLC v. Standridge Logistics & Consulting, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transport Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: Henry Edward Seaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standridge Logistics & Consulting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taimen Transport, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Try Hours Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Freight Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bolt Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TA Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxter Bailey & Associates
Represented By: Travis Edgar Davison, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?