Harris v. State of Tennessee et al
Plaintiff: Quannah Harris doing business as Last Minute Cuts School of Barbering and Cosmetology (Barber School License #29) (Cosmetology School License #92)
Defendant: State of Tennessee, Tennessee Department of Commerce and Insurance, Office of the Secretary of State and Administrative Procedures Division and Mattielyn Williams
Case Number: 2:2022cv02478
Filed: July 26, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Mark S Norris
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2022 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by All Defendants. (Wike, Jonathan)
September 12, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION [Text Only - No Image Attached]: (re #12 Setting Letter) Scheduling Conference set for 9/29/2022 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham has been CANCELED. To be reset later by separate notice. (tlh)
September 7, 2022 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, 9/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 - Memphis before Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham. (tlh)
September 7, 2022 Filing 11 Plaintiff's (RESPONSE in) Opposition to the Defendant's Motion re #10 to Dismiss filed by Quannah Harris. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum to Support Plaintiff's Opposition to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(csf)
August 29, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Wike, Jonathan)
August 16, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quannah Harris as to State of Tennessee, Mattielyn Williams. (btg)
August 9, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Office of the Secretary of State and Administrative Procedures Division, Mattielyn Williams. The filer was given two copies of each summons to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(btg)
August 9, 2022 Filing 7 PRO SE AMENDED COMPLAINT against Office of the Secretary of State and Administrative Procedures Division, Mattielyn Williams, filed by Quannah Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(btg)
July 26, 2022 Filing 6 Case initiation fee: $ 402, receipt number M4676052584. (btg)
July 26, 2022 Filing 5 Agreement to Receive Notice of Electronic Filing by Quannah Harris. (btg)
July 26, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (btg)
July 26, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (btg)
July 26, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (btg)
July 26, 2022 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants, filed by Quannah Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Judicial Cards)(btg)
July 26, 2022 Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters. Pursuant to Local Rule 4.1(b)(1), the plaintiff shall present the Clerk with a properly completed summons for each defendant, and the Clerk shall issue the summons(es) to the plaintiff for service on the defendant(s). (csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. State of Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quannah Harris doing business as Last Minute Cuts School of Barbering and Cosmetology (Barber School License #29) (Cosmetology School License #92)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Tennessee
Represented By: Jonathan N. Wike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Department of Commerce and Insurance
Represented By: Jonathan N. Wike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Secretary of State and Administrative Procedures Division
Represented By: Jonathan N. Wike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mattielyn Williams
Represented By: Jonathan N. Wike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?