Tomlinson v. United States of America
Petitioner: Christopher Tomlinson
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2022cv02740
Filed: October 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: John Thomas Fowlkes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing United States to respond to #5 Amended 2255 Motion. Signed by Judge John Thomas Fowlkes, Jr. on 12/06/2022. (Fowlkes, J.)
November 21, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence against United States of America, filed by Christopher Tomlinson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(csf)
November 1, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy Karla Cornejo on behalf of United States of America (Cornejo, Wendy)
October 26, 2022 Filing 4 ATTACHMENT to #1 Pro Se Complaint. Order Directing Clerk to Docket 2255 Motion in Civil Case (Opened as this instant case) and ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE AN AMENDED 2255 MOTION ON THE OFFICIAL FORM. (Originally filed in criminal case 19-20189 ((ECF No. 53)). (csf)
October 20, 2022 Filing 6 Memorandum In Support Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (18 USC 2255), filed by Christopher Tomlinson.(mlk)
October 20, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
October 20, 2022 Filing 1 PRO SE Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct a Sentence filed by Christopher Tomlinson against United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomlinson v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Tomlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: 2255 AUSA
Represented By: Wendy Karla Cornejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?