Houston v. BBQVC Food Group LLC
Plaintiff: Artisha Houston
Defendant: BBQVC Food Group LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv02780
Filed: November 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Stanley N Medlin on behalf of All Defendants (Medlin, Stanley)
December 9, 2022 Filing 15 SETTING LETTER: A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE pursuant to Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure has been SET for THURSDAY, JANUARY 19, 2023 at 1:30 P.M. (CST) before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The conference will be held via Microsoft Teams Video. A link to the video conference will be emailed to the attorneys prior to the setting.If the parties consent to have the case heard by the magistrate, please file your consent and this conference will be cancelled.Counsel should be prepared to discuss all pending motions.PLEASE REVIEW THE ATTACHED INSTRUCTIONS. The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. (jpw)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. BBQVC Food Group LLC answer due 1/9/2023. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/7/2022. (shl)
December 5, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, proposed order submitted by BBQVC Food Group LLC. (Griffee, J.)
December 5, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Mark Griffee on behalf of BBQVC Food Group LLC (Griffee, J.)
November 23, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Artisha Houston as to BBQVC Food Group LLC. (Nilges, Hans)
November 18, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robi J. Baishnab on behalf of Artisha Houston (Baishnab, Robi)
November 18, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Hans Nilges on behalf of Artisha Houston (Nilges, Hans)
November 10, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE by Artisha Houston Notice Of Filing Consent To Join Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent To Join Forms)(Bigelow, Robert)
November 10, 2022 Filing 7 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint, filed by Artisha Houston has been filed. For future reference, please note Civil Cover Sheet requires a electronic signature not a wet signature. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (csf)
November 10, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to BBQVC Food Group LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (csf)
November 10, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (csf)
November 10, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (csf)
November 10, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
November 10, 2022 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (csf)
November 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BBQVC Food Group LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-4011352), filed by Artisha Houston. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Exhibit Consent To Join)(Bigelow, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston v. BBQVC Food Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artisha Houston
Represented By: Robert C. Bigelow
Represented By: Hans Nilges
Represented By: Robi J. Baishnab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBQVC Food Group LLC
Represented By: J. Mark Griffee
Represented By: Stanley N Medlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?