Farmer v. Whaley's Auto Repair & Towing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rebecca Farmer
Defendant: Whaley's Auto Repair & Towing, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv02809
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2023 Filing 12 First ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , First COUNTERCLAIM against Whaley's Auto Repair & Towing, Inc. by Whaley's Auto Repair & Towing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Counter-Complaint Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Counter-Complaint Exhibit 2)(House, Nicholas)
December 30, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE by Whaley's Auto Repair & Towing, Inc. re #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or Stay Lawsuit Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or Stay Lawsuit (House, Nicholas)
December 22, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or Stay Lawsuit filed by Rebecca Farmer. (Oliphant, Philip)
December 12, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or Stay Lawsuit by Whaley's Auto Repair & Towing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(House, Nicholas)
December 12, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Francisco House on behalf of Whaley's Auto Repair & Towing, Inc. (House, Nicholas)
December 7, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Farmer as to Whaley's Auto Repair & Towing, Inc.. (Oliphant, Philip)
November 21, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Whaley's Auto Repair & Towing, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (mlk)
November 21, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mlk)
November 21, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mlk)
November 21, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mlk)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (mlk)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Whaley's Auto Repair & Towing, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-4018546), filed by Rebecca Farmer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Oliphant, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmer v. Whaley's Auto Repair & Towing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Farmer
Represented By: Philip Eric Oliphant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whaley's Auto Repair & Towing, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Francisco House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?