Pritchard v. Thompson et al
Plaintiff: Chris A. Pritchard
Defendant: Aaron Thompson, Harman Connected Services and Samsung Electronics
Case Number: 2:2022cv02838
Filed: December 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to be Temporarily Excused from Compliance with Local Patent Rules Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss proposed order submitted by Harman Connected Services, Aaron Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Woo, Darryl)
February 6, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Harman Connected Services, Aaron Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Thompson, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G)(Woo, Darryl)
January 26, 2023 Filing 19 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US D 904, 258 S; US 17/211,384. (cdi)
January 23, 2023 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Harman Connected Services, Samsung Electronics, Aaron Thompson, filed by Chris A. Pritchard.(mlk)
January 12, 2023 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harman Connected Services identifying Corporate Parent Harman International Industries, Inc. for Harman Connected Services.. (Woo, Darryl)
January 11, 2023 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on January 11, 2023. (cmp)
January 11, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-4048642) by Harman Connected Services, Aaron Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Woo, Darryl)
January 11, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-4048445) by Harman Connected Services, Aaron Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Wu, Huiya)
January 6, 2023 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. For good cause shown, the unopposed motion is GRANTED. Defendants' response to the complaint is due February 6, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on January 6, 2023. (TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY) (cmp)
January 5, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint; Proposed Order Submitted by Harman Connected Services, Aaron Thompson. (Ginther, Matthew)
January 5, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Ginther on behalf of Harman Connected Services, Aaron Thompson (Ginther, Matthew)
December 29, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chris A. Pritchard as to Harman Connected Services. (mlk)
December 29, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chris A. Pritchard as to Samsung Electronics. (mlk)
December 29, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chris A. Pritchard as to Aaron Thompson. (mlk)
December 13, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Harman Connected Services, Samsung Electronics, Aaron Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Thompson Summons, #2 Harman Summons)(jae)
December 9, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE: Signed agreement to receive notice of electronic filing (NEF) by Chris A. Pritchard (csf)
December 9, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (csf)
December 9, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (csf)
December 9, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Complex track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
December 9, 2022 Filing 2 Case initiation fee: PAID $ 402.00, receipt number 200000397 (csf)
December 9, 2022 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT Under 28 U.S.C. 1338pt against All Defendants, filed by Chris A. Pritchard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Judicial Cards)(csf)
December 9, 2022 Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters. Pursuant to Local Rule 4.1(b)(1), the plaintiff shall present the Clerk with a properly completed summons for each defendant, and the Clerk shall issue the summons(es) to the plaintiff for service on the defendant(s). (csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pritchard v. Thompson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris A. Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Thompson
Represented By: Darryl M. Woo
Represented By: Huiya Wu
Represented By: Matthew Ginther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harman Connected Services
Represented By: Darryl M. Woo
Represented By: Huiya Wu
Represented By: Matthew Ginther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?