Merritt v. WIPRO LIMITED
Plaintiff: Kenneth Merritt
Defendant: WIPRO LIMITED
Not Classified By Court: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2023cv02453
Filed: July 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2023 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Strike #19 Response in Support of Motion, #18 Notice (Other), #17 Notice (Other) filed by Kenneth Merritt. (agj)
August 30, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Strike #19 Response in Support of Motion, #18 Notice (Other), #17 Notice (Other) by WIPRO LIMITED. (Hansen, Kaitlyn)
August 23, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Kenneth Merritt. (jae)
August 23, 2023 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Kenneth Merritt to Defendant's assertion regarding discovery. (jae)
August 23, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE by Kenneth Merritt re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jae)
August 21, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE by WIPRO LIMITED re #13 Notice (Other) Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Objection to Defendant's Notice of Removal (Hansen, Kaitlyn)
August 21, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE by WIPRO LIMITED re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Defendant's Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Hansen, Kaitlyn)
August 14, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Defendant's Memorandum in Support of re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kenneth Merritt. (agj)
August 8, 2023 Filing 13 OBJECTION by Kenneth Merritt re #1 Notice of Removal, (jae)
August 7, 2023 Filing 12 Pro Se RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Kenneth Merritt. (mlk)
August 7, 2023 Filing 11 Pro Se Response Objecting to Defendants Request for Removal to Federal Court re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Kenneth Merritt. (mlk)
August 2, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew G. Gallagher on behalf of WIPRO LIMITED (Gallagher, Matthew)
August 2, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlyn Abernathy Hansen on behalf of WIPRO LIMITED (Hansen, Kaitlyn)
August 2, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by WIPRO LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #2 Exhibit A. State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B. State Court Briefing, #4 Exhibit C. Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #5 Exhibit D. Transcript of Hearing)(Hansen, Kaitlyn)
August 2, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE by WIPRO LIMITED re #6 Notice (Other) Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-DECLARATION OF ANKOOR BAGCHI)(Hansen, Kaitlyn)
July 31, 2023 Filing 6 OBJECTION by Kenneth Merritt re #1 Notice of Removal, (jae)
July 28, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
July 28, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
July 28, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
July 28, 2023 Filing 2 Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae)
July 28, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WIPRO LIMITED from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-2016-23 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-4195465), filed by WIPRO LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint and Summons, #3 Exhibit Shelby County Circuit Court Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit Declaration, #5 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal (State Court))(Hansen, Kaitlyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merritt v. WIPRO LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WIPRO LIMITED
Represented By: Kaitlyn Abernathy Hansen
Represented By: Matthew G. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?