Benson v. The Healthcare Staff of the Shelby County Criminal Justice Center
Plaintiff: Rickey Benson
Defendant: The Healthcare Staff of the Shelby County Criminal Justice Center
Case Number: 2:2023cv02510
Filed: August 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2023 Filing 18 Notice: Second Petition for Civil Docket of Complaint for Civil Rights Violation by Rickey Benson (csf)
September 14, 2023 Filing 17 Pro Se MOTION for the Court to Grant Alternate Dispute Resolution of Early Settlement or Set Case for Speedy Trial by Rickey Benson. (csf)
August 30, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION of Third Discovery to Support Motion by Rickey Benson. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(agj)
August 30, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Enjoin Fifth Crossclaim and Additional Defendant by Rickey Benson. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(agj)
August 30, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION of Fourth Discovery to Support Motion to Enjoin Fourth Crossclaim by Rickey Benson. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(agj)
August 29, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Enjoin Third Crossclaim and Additional Defendant by Rickey Benson. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(agj)
August 28, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Enjoin Fourth Crossclaim and Additional Defendant by Rickey Benson. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(agj)
August 28, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Enjoin Third Crossclaim and Additional Defendant by Rickey Benson. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(agj)
August 18, 2023 Filing 9 REQUEST (filed as a motion for discovery to support original action) by Rickey Benson. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
August 18, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for judge to issue subpoena upon third party by Rickey Benson. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
August 18, 2023 Filing 7 Motion for crossclaim and Discovery to support original actions by Rickey Benson. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
August 18, 2023 Filing 6 ATTACHMENT to #1 Pro Se Complaint, by Rickey Benson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope)(jae)
August 18, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for amended relief (taxation of Costs) by Rickey Benson. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
August 18, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to grant injunction to transfer plaintiff to another facility on protective custody by Rickey Benson. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
August 14, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
August 14, 2023 Filing 2 Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rickey Benson. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Balance History Report)(csf)
August 14, 2023 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights Under 42 U.S.C. 1983 against The Healthcare Staff of the Shelby County Criminal Justice Center, filed by Rickey Benson. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Grievance Form and Response, #2 Envelope, #3 Case assignment label)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benson v. The Healthcare Staff of the Shelby County Criminal Justice Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickey Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Healthcare Staff of the Shelby County Criminal Justice Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?