Edwards v. Bonner et al
Plaintiff: Carolyn Edwards
Defendant: Floyd Bonner, Kirk Fields, Mischelle Alexander-Best and Shelby County, Tennessee
Case Number: 2:2023cv02561
Filed: September 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Mark S Norris
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2023 Filing 22 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 11/2/23. (Norris, Mark)
November 2, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carolyn Edwards (Edgington, Craig)
November 2, 2023 Filing 20 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #19 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Carolyn Edwards has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: the CM/ECF user's login name does not match the electronic signature on the pleading. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (mf)
November 1, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carolyn Edwards (Timmons, Brice)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY -- NO IMAGE ATTACHED**] ORDER GRANTING #17 MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE. Plaintiff's unopposed Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have up to and including November 3, 2023 in which to amend the Complaint or respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 10/24/23. (Norris, Mark)
October 23, 2023 Filing 17 First MOTION to Extend Deadline Proposed Order Submitted by Carolyn Edwards. (Timmons, Brice)
September 29, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Alternative, MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, by Mischelle Alexander-Best, Floyd Bonner, Kirk Fields, Shelby County, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Warrant, #3 Exhibit B - Public Case History, #4 Exhibit C - ROR, #5 Exhibit D - General Sessions Jacket, #6 Exhibit E - Bench Warrant, #7 Exhibit F - ROR)(Tilly, Nathan)
September 29, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Haynes T. Russell on behalf of Mischelle Alexander-Best, Floyd Bonner, Kirk Fields, Shelby County, Tennessee (Russell, Haynes)
September 29, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Daniel Tilly on behalf of Mischelle Alexander-Best, Floyd Bonner, Kirk Fields, Shelby County, Tennessee (Tilly, Nathan)
September 18, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolyn Edwards as to Mischelle Alexander-Best. (Timmons, Brice)
September 18, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolyn Edwards as to Shelby County, Tennessee. (Timmons, Brice)
September 18, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolyn Edwards as to Kirk Fields. (Timmons, Brice)
September 18, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolyn Edwards as to Floyd Bonner. (Timmons, Brice)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO MODIFY DOCKET. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 9/7/23. (Norris, Mark)
September 6, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Mischelle Alexander-Best, Floyd Bonner, Kirk Fields, Shelby County, Tennessee. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons, #3 summons)(jae)
September 6, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
September 6, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
September 6, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
September 6, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Stewart on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Stewart, Melissa)
September 6, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig A Edgington on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Edgington, Craig)
September 6, 2023 Filing 2 Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
September 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-4227873), filed by Carolyn Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Summons Sheriff Floyd Bonner, #2 Summons Chief Jailer Kirk Fields, #3 Summons Mischelle Alexander-Best, #4 Summons Shelby County, Tennessee, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Timmons, Brice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Bonner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Edwards
Represented By: Craig A Edgington
Represented By: Melissa Stewart
Represented By: Brice Moffatt Timmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floyd Bonner
Represented By: Haynes T. Russell
Represented By: Nathan Daniel Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Fields
Represented By: Nathan Daniel Tilly
Represented By: Haynes T. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mischelle Alexander-Best
Represented By: Nathan Daniel Tilly
Represented By: Haynes T. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby County, Tennessee
Represented By: Nathan Daniel Tilly
Represented By: Haynes T. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?