Sheppard v. Livingston et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Lee Sheppard
Defendant: Brad Livingston, Darren B Wallace, Henry E Adams, Kevin D Masters and Pedro Boykin
Case Number: 1:2012cv00169
Filed: April 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Beaumont Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Marcia A. Crone
Presiding Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 231 MEMORANDUM ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS AND ADOPTING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiff's 213 Motion for Default Judgment is denied. Signed by District Judge Ron Clark on 3/23/18. (mrp, )
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MEMORANDUM ORDER overruling objections and adopting the magistrate judge's 220 Report and Recommendation. The motion to dismiss is granted and plaintiff's claims relating to growing a beard is dismissed without prejudice as moot. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 9/12/2017. (bjc, )
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 140 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 3/26/15. (dlc, )
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MEMORANDUM ORDER ADOPTING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the 83 Motion to Dismiss be granted. Plaintiff's claim under the First Amendment is dismissed. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 3/13/15. (mrp, )
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS AND ADOPTING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiff's # 105 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is denied. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 3/6/15. (mrp, )
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MEMORANDUM ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION regarding 101 Report and Recommendations. The objections filed by plaintiff are OVERRULED. The findings of fact and conclusions of law of the magistrate judge are correct, and the report of the magistrate judge is ADOPTED. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction is DENIED. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 8/20/14. (dlc, )
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MEMORANDUM ORDER ADOPTING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for 37 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Curtis Lee Sheppard. Plaintiff's motion for default judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 7/14/14. (dlc, )
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS AND ADOPTING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the 28 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Curtis Lee Sheppard should be denied. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 2/28/14. (mrp, )
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM ORDER overruling objections and adopting the magistrate judge's 32 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's motions seeking a default judgment are denied. Signed by Judge Marcia A. Crone on 1/9/2014. (bjc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheppard v. Livingston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Lee Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren B Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry E Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin D Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Boykin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?