Hall v. Shynett et al
Plaintiff: Mitch Hall
Defendant: Betty Shynett, Lisa Wood and Robert H Kane, Jr
Case Number: 1:2013cv00233
Filed: April 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Beaumont Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Presiding Judge: Keith F. Giblin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER adopting 125 Report and Recommendation and granting defts' motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/2/16. (tkd, )
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER adopting 107 Report and Recommendation and denying 81 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Mitch Hall. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/31/15. (tkd, )
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER overruling objections and adopting 92 Report and Recommendation. Pltf's 76 Motion for Default Judgment is denied. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/23/15. (tkd, )
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER overruling objections and adopting 55 Report and Recommendation. Pltf's 20 Motion for Default Judgment is denied. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/29/14. (tkd, )
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER adopting the magistrate judge's 55 Report and Recommendation. The motion for default judgment is denied. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/9/2014. (bjc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Shynett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitch Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Shynett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert H Kane, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?