Blount v. Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen

Plaintiff: Anthony Blount
Defendant: Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen
Case Number: 1:2018cv00406
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Beaumont Office
County: Newton
0 Judge: Marcia A Crone
1 Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Marshal. Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen served on 9/28/2018. (tkd, )
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen (tkd, )
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to issue process and the US Marshal is directed to serve it upon deft Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 9/24/18. (tkd, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn: Motion Hearing held on 9/24/2018 re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Anthony Blount and Evidentiary Hearing held on 9/24/2018. Court will enter order. (DCR - Jill Veazey.) (jmv, )
August 27, 2018 Filing 5 Certified Mail GREEN CARD showing receipt of #4 Order by Anthony Blount. (tkd, )
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Hearing on #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis for 9/24/2018 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Order also setting non-adversarial Evidentiary Hearing for 9/24/2018 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 8/21/18. (tkd, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment sent by US Mail to pro se plaintiff (aam, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Blount. (aam, )
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn pursuant to GO 05-07 (aam, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, filed by Anthony Blount. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aam, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blount v. Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Blount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?