Vierling v. E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
Plaintiff: Andrew Vierling
Defendant: E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00450
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Vierling. E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company waiver sent on 10/10/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Tolin, David)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS REISSUED as to E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company and handed to Plaintiff's Attorney for service (aam, )
September 20, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company and handed to plaintiff's atty for service (aam, )
September 19, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (aam, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Andrew Vierling against E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6949160.), filed by Andrew Vierling. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tolin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vierling v. E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Vierling
Represented By: David L Tolin
Represented By: David L Tolin, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?