INTEGR8 FUELS INC. v. M/V PORT UNION

Plaintiff: INTEGR8 FUELS INC.
Defendant: M/V PORT UNION, Novellas MT St Clemens GMBH & Co KG, Union Commercial Services GMBH & Co, Novellas MT St Georg GMBH & Co KG, Novellas MT St Lukas GMBH & Co KG, Novellas Union GMBH & Co. KG, Union Maritime LTD and Novellas Maritime SARL
Case Number: 1:2018cv00542
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER of dismissal. In accordance with Plaintiff Integr8 Fuels Inc.s Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice (#13), filed October 26, 2018, this action is dismissed in its entirety, without prejudice. All pending motions are denied as moot. Each party shall bear its own costs of court and attorneys fees. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 10/29/2018. (bjc, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 14 Marshal's Return of Service Executed re release of vessel from seizure. (bjc, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by INTEGR8 FUELS INC. (Haines, Julia)
October 26, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Consent to Release of the Vessel by INTEGR8 FUELS INC.. (Haines, Julia) Modified on 10/29/2018 (bjc, ).
October 24, 2018 Filing 11 Marshal's Return of Service Executed as to MV Port Union. (bjc, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 10 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by INTEGR8 FUELS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Order for Issuance of a Warrant, #2 Warrant to Seize, #3 Amended Rule B Order Port Union, #4 Amended Rule 4 Order Port Stewart/Port Said, #5 Writ of Attachment)(Haines, Julia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2018: #6 Text of Proposed Order) (bjc, ).
October 24, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against M/V PORT UNION, filed by INTEGR8 FUELS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Haines, Julia)
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 WARRANT to Seize Vessel issued and given to USM for service. (mrp, )
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to Seize a Vessel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 10/22/18. (mrp, )
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for issuance of a warrant of martime arrest. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 10/22/18. (mrp, )
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Appointment of Substitute Custodian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 10/22/18. (mrp, )
October 22, 2018 District Judge Marcia A. Crone added. (dlc, )
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION re #1 Complaint, by INTEGR8 FUELS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Haines, Julia)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION re #1 Complaint, by INTEGR8 FUELS INC.. (Haines, Julia)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION Issuance of Order to Seize a Vessel re #1 Complaint, by INTEGR8 FUELS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Errata B)(Haines, Julia)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6991634.), filed by INTEGR8 FUELS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons(es))(Haines, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INTEGR8 FUELS INC. v. M/V PORT UNION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V PORT UNION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novellas MT St Clemens GMBH & Co KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Commercial Services GMBH & Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novellas MT St Georg GMBH & Co KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novellas MT St Lukas GMBH & Co KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novellas Union GMBH & Co. KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Maritime LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novellas Maritime SARL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTEGR8 FUELS INC.
Represented By: Julia M Haines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?