Saleme v. State Farm Lloyds et al
Plaintiff: Leroy Saleme
Defendant: State Farm Lloyds, Worley Claims Services, LLC and Mark H. Fritz
Case Number: 1:2018cv00632
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Referring Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED that the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant Worley Claims Services, LLC (Doc. No. 9) is granted and Salemes causes of action against Worley are dismissed without prejudice. Ordered that Worley's #4 Motion to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) is denied as moot. Ordered that each party is to bear its own costs of court. Saleme's claims against other Defendants shall not be affected in any way by Worley's dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 1/22/2019. (bjc, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant, Worley Claims Services, LLC by Leroy Saleme. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ramsey, Michael)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Mark H. Fritz and emailed to plaintiff's atty for service (aam, )
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that Saleme's #5 Motion for extension of time to file response/reply is granted and the deadline for Saleme to respond is extended until January 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 1/3/2019. (bjc, )
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 1/2/2019. (bjc, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Leroy Saleme. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramsey, Michael)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) in Lieu of Answer by Worley Claims Services, LLC. (Schexnayder, Martin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2018: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (bjc, ).
December 20, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT IN CAUSE NUMBER D-202916 AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS EXHIBIT B***PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION against All Defendants, filed by Leroy Saleme.(aam, )
December 20, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Leroy Saleme. (aam, )
December 20, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (aam, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Lloyds from 136th District Court, case number D-202916. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7071773), filed by State Farm Lloyds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Certified Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit Index and All State Filings, #4 Exhibit List of Parties and Attorneys, #5 Exhibit Parties Requesting Trial by Jury, #6 Exhibit Statement Regarding Case Status)(Surratt, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saleme v. State Farm Lloyds et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Lloyds
Represented By: David Jefferson Fisher
Represented By: Stephanie Donean Surratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worley Claims Services, LLC
Represented By: Martin Samuel Schexnayder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark H. Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Saleme
Represented By: Michael R Ramsey
Represented By: Katherine DeEtte Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?