Champagne et al v. Cenlar FSB et al
Plaintiff: Jason Champagne and Brandy Champagne
Defendant: Cenlar FSB, Albertelli Law and Amerihome Mortgage Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00020
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference RESET for 4/1/2019 11:15 AM before District Judge Marcia A. Crone in chambers. (jc, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Amerihome Mortgage Company, LLC, Cenlar FSB . (Neff, Sabrina)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Neff, Sabrina)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference re Notice of Hearing by Amerihome Mortgage Company, LLC, Cenlar FSB. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Neff, Sabrina)
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal filed by Brandy Champagne, Jason Champagne. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sparks, Mark)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 Opposed MOTION to Remand filed by Amerihome Mortgage Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand)(Neff, Sabrina)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Amerihome Mortgage Company, LLC re #6 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Neff, Sabrina)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal by Amerihome Mortgage Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal)(Neff, Sabrina)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 Opposed MOTION to Remand by Brandy Champagne, Jason Champagne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sparks, Mark)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Notice of Removal,.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B3, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B4, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B5, #9 Exhibit Exhibit B6, #10 Exhibit Exhibit B7, #11 Exhibit Exhibit B8, #12 Exhibit Exhibit B9, #13 Exhibit Exhibit B10, #14 Exhibit Exhibit B11, #15 Exhibit Exhibit B12, #16 Exhibit Exhibit B13, #17 Exhibit Exhibit B14, #18 Exhibit Exhibit B15, #19 Exhibit Exhibit C, #20 Exhibit Exhibit D, #21 Exhibit Exhibit E, #22 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Neff, Sabrina)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference with a proposed Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 1/15/19. (mrp, )
January 15, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
January 15, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 3/18/2019 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Marcia A. Crone in chambers. (jc, )
January 14, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (aam, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amerihome Mortgage Company, LLC from 58th JDC of Jefferson County, Texas, case number A-202999. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7096730), filed by Amerihome Mortgage Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B2, Plaintiffs' Original Petition)(Neff, Sabrina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Champagne et al v. Cenlar FSB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cenlar FSB
Represented By: Sabrina A Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertelli Law
Represented By: Coury Matthews Jacocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerihome Mortgage Company, LLC
Represented By: Sabrina A Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Champagne
Represented By: Mark Christopher Sparks
Represented By: Timothy Monroe Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Champagne
Represented By: Mark Christopher Sparks
Represented By: Timothy Monroe Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?