Jimmerson v. Segura et al
Plaintiff: Steven M Jimmerson
Defendant: SIA Childrens, R. Segura, #1 John Doe, USP-Beamont Warden, #2 John Doe, Cert Team, Federal Bureau of Prisons and Dr Brown
Case Number: 1:2019cv00104
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Referring Judge: Keith F Giblin
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending this case should be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 4/12/2019. (bjc, )
February 27, 2019 NOTICE of Case Assignment sent by US Mail to Pro Se Plaintiff (aam, )
February 26, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Steven M Jimmerson. (aam, )
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin pursuant to GO 05-04 (aam, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00047. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 25, 2019 Docket Annotation; pursuant to BOP locator, address updated to FTC Oklahoma City. (amb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/26/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 2/25/2019 TRANSFERRING case to US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Steven Jimmerson at FTC Oklahoma City)(cb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/26/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge David E Jones no longer assigned to the case. (amb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/26/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address as to Steven M Jimmerson. Address updated to Florence USP High. (amb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/26/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Steven M Jimmerson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (amb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/26/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that on or before 1/30/2019 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 24.70 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 01/09/2019. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to plaintiff and warden)(amb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/26/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge David E. Jones and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (blr) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/26/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Steven M Jimmerson. (blr) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/26/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Steven M Jimmerson. (blr) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/26/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against Dr Brown, CERT Team, John Doe #1, John Doe #2, Federal Bureau of Prisons, SIA Childrens, R Segura, USP-Beamont Warden by Steven M Jimmerson. (blr) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/26/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimmerson v. Segura et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIA Childrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: #1 John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USP-Beamont Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: #2 John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cert Team
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven M Jimmerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?