United States of America v. $34,990.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $34,990.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Jose Bello Amigo
Case Number: 1:2019cv00112
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Referring Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to conduct Rule 26(f) conference no later than Monday, April 29, 2019. Joint written report filed no later than Monday, May 13, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 4/8/2019. (bjc, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 CLAIM Verified Claim by Jose Bello Amigo. (Zavala, Charles)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Denial by Jose Bello Amigo.(Zavala, Charles) Modified on 4/4/2019 (bjc, ).
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Charles Zavala on behalf of $34,990.00 in United States Currency. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7210772. (Zavala, Charles)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by US Marshal. Deft currency served with a copy of the complaint, notice, order for warrant and warrant on 3/21/2019 (tkd, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT of Arrest in Rem issued (tkd, )
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR WARRANT of Arrest In Rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 3/4/19. (tkd, )
March 1, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn pursuant to GO 93-11 (aam, )
March 1, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (aam, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in Rem against $34,990.00 in United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order for Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #2 Application for Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lockhart, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $34,990.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $34,990.00 in United States Currency
Represented By: Charles Zavala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael Wayne Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jose Bello Amigo
Represented By: Charles Zavala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?