MOTTON v. BUREAU OF PRISONS et al
Plaintiff: CHARLES MOTTON, III
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons, SHARON MILLER, Issam Harmoush, PLESSALA H., CLINT CONNIER, League Medical Concept, Eric Wooten, Correct Care Solutions, ZEUS ARCO, Dr Sreedhar Polavarapu, Christus Hospital St. Elizabeth, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE and JASON BABCOCK
Case Number: 1:2019cv00158
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Referring Judge: Keith F Giblin
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin pursuant to GO 05-04 (aam, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 55 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:18-cv-01693. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 29, 2019 Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, pursuant to the Court Order entered 03/27/2019. Sent to Court via by extraction. (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting the Federal Defendants' Motion to Transfer Case #43 , and directing the immediate transfer of the case to the Eastern District of Texas (see document for details). Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/27/19.(ah) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
March 27, 2019 NOTICE OF ERROR re #51 Reply to opposition to Motion; emailed to anthony.gill@dlapiper.com, cc'd 16 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. FOR FUTURE FILINGS - Signature must match login/password on pleading(s) (zjf, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
March 27, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #49 Memorandum was entered in error and refiled by the clerk's office under the correct category. (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 51 REPLY to opposition to motion re #32 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by CHRISTUS HOSPITAL ST. ELIZABETH. (Gill, Anthony) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 50 REPLY to opposition to motion re #43 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint MOTION to Transfer Case filed by BUREAU OF PRISONS, CLINT CONNIER, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Cirino, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 53 Memorandum in opposition to re #33 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by CHARLES MOTTON, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 52 REPLY in support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS. (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 49 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MEMORANDUM re #37 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS. (Pickett, Amber) Modified on 3/27/2019 (jf). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 48 Memorandum in opposition to re #32 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by CHARLES MOTTON, III. (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 47 Memorandum in opposition to re #43 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint MOTION to Transfer Case filed by CHARLES MOTTON, III. (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 46 Memorandum in opposition to re #37 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CHARLES MOTTON, III. (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Partial Filing Fee Received from Plaintiff in the amount of $9.00, receipt number: 4616097117. (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Partial Filing Fee Received from Charles Motton, III in the amount of $3.60, receipt number: 4616096711. (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 4/1/2019. (zjd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order advising plaintiff to respond by April 1, 2019, to Defendants' #43 Motion to Dismiss or risk entry of judgment in favor of Defendant. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/8/2019. (lcapm2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Proposed Order by BUREAU OF PRISONS, CLINT CONNIER, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re #43 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint MOTION to Transfer Case (Cirino, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, MOTION to Transfer Case by BUREAU OF PRISONS, CLINT CONNIER, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration (Supplemental) of An Tran, #3 Declaration (Supplemental) of Dawn Payne)(Cirino, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Bureau of Prisons and United States Department of Justice shall file their answer on or before 2/8/2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/4/2019 (lcapm2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 42 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #29 Amended Complaint, by BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Bureau of Prisons and United States Department of Justice's Answer due by 2/8/2019. Plaintiff's Opposition due by 4/1/2019. (zjd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's #40 Motion for Extension of Time. The court grants plaintiff a 60-day extension. Plaintiff's opposition to all motions to dismiss, including the anticipated motion to dismiss from Federal Defendants, is due on April 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/29/2019. (lcapm2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time by CHARLES MOTTON, III (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Partial Filing Fee Received from Charles Motton, III in the amount of $67.75, receipt number: 4616096429. (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
January 15, 2019 MINUTE ORDER. To clarify any confusion that may have resulted from the court's Minute Order of 1/4/2019, this case is stayed only as to the Government defendants. Signed by Amit P. Mehta on 1/15/2019. (lcapm2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 2/4/2019. (zjd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order advising plaintiff to respond by February 4, 2019, to Defendant's #37 Motion to Dismiss or risk entry of judgment in favor of Defendant. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/9/2019. (lcapm2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER informing Plaintiff that the January 18, 2019 deadline to respond to Government's #28 Motion to Dismiss is vacated. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/8/2019. (lcapm2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Order denying Government's #36 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Amended Complaint as moot. The court mistakenly assumed that the Government Defendants' motion to dismiss filed on December 18, 2018, ECF No. 28, was directed at the Amended Complaint and for that reason denied the stay request. In light of the clarification provided in Defendants' Motion, the court will stay this matter until Department of Justice operations resume. Defendants shall file their responsive pleading to the Amended Complaint no later than seven days after Department of Justice operations resume. Therefore, the Motion to Extend Time is denied as moot. The Government Defendants' motion to dismiss filed at ECF No. #28 likewise is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/4/2019. (lcapm2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pickett, Amber) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #29 Amended Complaint, by BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 2/4/2019. (zjd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order advising plaintiff to respond by February 4, 2019, to Defendants' #32 and #33 Motions to Dismiss or risk entry of judgment in favor of Defendants. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/3/2019. (lcapm2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice the Federal Government Defendants' #34 Motion to Stay. In the case's present posture, no stay is warranted, as there is no imminent deadline for the Federal Defendants. The Federal Defendants may renew their motion should the shutdown continue and interfere with meeting an imminent deadline. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/2/2019. (lcapm2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
December 31, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse In Appropriations by BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Cirino, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by JASON BABCOCK, ERIC WOOTEN (Emig, Gerard) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
December 27, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by CHRISTUS HOSPITAL ST. ELIZABETH (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibits A - B to Memorandum, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gately, Mary) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Paul Cirino on behalf of BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Joshua M. Kolsky (Cirino, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. As a consequence of Plaintiff's filing of an Amended Complaint, ECF No. #29 , the motions to dismiss filed at ECF Nos. #15 , #16 , and #18 , are hereby denied as moot. The Amended Complaint is now the operative pleading. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/19/2018. (lcapm2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 1/18/2019. (zjd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order advising plaintiff to respond by January 18, 2019, to Defendants' #28 Motion to Dismiss or risk entry of judgment in favor of Defendants. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/18/2018. (lcapm2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer by BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration (Tran), #3 Declaration (Payne))(Kolsky, Joshua). Added MOTION to Transfer Case on 12/19/2018 (jf). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kolsky, Joshua) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JASON BABCOCK, BUREAU OF PRISONS, CHRISTUS HOSPITAL ST. ELIZABETH, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, PLESSALA H., ISSAM HARMOUSH, LEAGUE MEDICAL CONCEPT, SREEDHAR POLAVARAPU, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, ERIC WOOTEN, CLINT CONNIER, ZEUS ARCO with Jury Demand filed by CHARLES MOTTON, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
December 11, 2018 Partial Filing Fee Received from Charles Motton, III in the amount of $13.00, receipt number: 4616095805. (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 26 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 11/30/2018 (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 25 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to LEAGUE MEDICAL CONCEPT. (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Partial Filing Fee Received from Charles Motton III in the amount of $13.18, receipt number: 4616095485. (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 23 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to PLESSALA H., SREEDHAR POLAVARAPU. (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 24 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to ISSAM HARMOUSH. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 12/13/2018. (zjd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond by December 13, 2018, to Defendants' #18 Motion to Dismiss or risk entry of judgment in favor of Defendants. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/1/2018. (lcapm2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Filing 22 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/3/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/3/2018. (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Amber R. Pickett is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/31/2018. (lcapm2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Nichol L. Bunn is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/31/2018. (lcapm2) Modified on 11/1/2018 (zjd). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Amber R. Pickett, :Firm- Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP, :Address- 2100 Ross Avenue, Suite 2000, Dallas, Texas 75201. Phone No. - 214-722-7105. Fax No. - 972-638-8664 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5767994. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, SHARON MILLER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration A. Pickett, #3 Declaration N. Bunn)(Krause, Robert) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nichol Bunn, :Firm- Lewis Brisbois Bisgarrd & Smith LLP, :Address- 2100 Rss Avenue, Suite 2000, Dallas, Texas 75201. Phone No. - 214-722-7105. Fax No. - 972-638-8664 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5767935. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, SHARON MILLER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration N. Bunn, #3 Declaration A. Pickett)(Krause, Robert) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, SHARON MILLER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Krause, Robert) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to #15 and #16 Motions due by 12/13/2018. (zjd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond by December 13, 2018, to Defendants' #15 and #16 Motions to Dismiss or risk entry of judgment in favor of Defendants. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/29/2018. (lcapm2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for More Definite Statement by CHRISTUS HOSPITAL ST. ELIZABETH (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gately, Mary). Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 10/29/2018 (jf). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Wooten, MD and Babcock, NP with Memorandum and proposed Order by JASON BABCOCK, ERIC WOOTEN (Roegge, Bradford) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Nicki K. Elgie is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/26/2018. (lcapm2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Blaine A. Holbrook is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/26/2018. (lcapm2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nicki K. Elgie, :Firm- Evans, Rowe & Holbrook, P.C., :Address- 10101 Reunion Place, Suite 900, San Antonio, Texas 78216. Phone No. - (210) 340-6555. Fax No. - (210) 340-6664 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5759186. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CHRISTUS HOSPITAL ST. ELIZABETH (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicki K. Elgie, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Gately, Mary) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Blaine A. Holbrook, :Firm- Evans, Rowe & Holbrook, P.C., :Address- 10101 Reunion Place, Suite 900, San Antonio, Texas 78216. Phone No. - (210) 340-6555. Fax No. - (210) 340-6664 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5759078. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CHRISTUS HOSPITAL ST. ELIZABETH (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Blaine A. Holbrook, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Gately, Mary) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony David Gill on behalf of CHRISTUS HOSPITAL ST. ELIZABETH (Gill, Anthony) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CHRISTUS HOSPITAL ST. ELIZABETH (Gately, Mary) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth Gately on behalf of CHRISTUS HOSPITAL ST. ELIZABETH (Gately, Mary) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/17/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/16/2018. (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JASON BABCOCK served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018; CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018; SHARON MILLER served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018 (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHRISTUS HOSPITAL ST. ELIZABETH served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018; ERIC WOOTEN served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018 (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS (13) Issued as to JASON BABCOCK, BUREAU OF PRISONS, CHRISTUS HOSPITAL ST. ELIZABETH, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, PLESSALA H., ISSAM HARMOUSH, LEAGUE MEDICAL CONCEPT, SHARON MILLER, SREEDHAR POLAVARAPU, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, ERIC WOOTEN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the court officers to prepare and serve process (see attached document for details). Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/19/18.(ah) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
September 11, 2018 Partial Filing Fee Received from CHARLES MOTTON III in the amount of $33.97, receipt number: 4616094469. (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
August 16, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zsth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $33.97 from Prison Account of Charles Motton, III and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/9/18. (zsth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by CHARLES MOTTON, III (zsb). Modified on 7/25/2018. Modified on 8/23/2018 (zsth). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CHARLES MOTTON, III(zsb). Modified on 7/25/2018. Modified on 8/23/2018 (zsth). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF PRISONS, et al. filed by CHARLES MOTTON III.(zsb) Modified on 7/25/2018 (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/25/2018: #1 attachment). Modified on 8/23/2018 (zsth). Modified to correct defendant name on 9/4/2018 (zjd).[Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 07/18/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/1/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOTTON v. BUREAU OF PRISONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHARON MILLER
Represented By: Amber R. Pickett
Represented By: Nichol L Bunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Issam Harmoush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLESSALA H.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLINT CONNIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: League Medical Concept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions
Represented By: Amber R. Pickett
Represented By: Nichol L Bunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZEUS ARCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Sreedhar Polavarapu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christus Hospital St. Elizabeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON BABCOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES MOTTON, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?