Gonzalez v. Medical Staff in Beaumont Med.
Plaintiff: Marcos Gonzalez
Defendant: Medical Staff in Beaumont Med.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00226
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Referring Judge: Thad Heartfield
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Of Case Assignment sent by US Mail to Pro Se Plaintiff.(aam, )
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn pursuant to GO 05-04 (aam, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-03441. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that the captioned matter be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, Beaumont Division. FURTHER ORDERED that determination of pauper status is DEFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, Beaumont Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 5/20/2019.(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/22/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcos Gonzalez. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Original Deficient Motion)(am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/22/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 5/6/2019. (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/22/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcos Gonzalez. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/22/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 DEFICIENT: COMPLAINT against Medical Staff in Beaumont Med. filed by Marcos Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Original Deficient Petition, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/22/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 4/17/2019. (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/22/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 DEFICIENT: Complaint against Medical Staff in Beaumont Med. filed by Marcos Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Medical Staff in Beaumont Med.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Staff in Beaumont Med.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?