Wolfcale v. State of Texas
Plaintiff: Eldon Wolfcale
Defendant: State of Texas
Case Number: 1:2019cv00271
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Referring Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #2 Order by Charles Danielson. (bjc, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Mail Returned as Unclaimed. Mail sent to Eldon Wolfcale. Doc# 4 and 2 orders. (bjc, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED Mail green card showing receipt of #4 ,and #2 orders and #1 complaint by Charles Danielson (bjc, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Charles Danielson on 6/27/19 of #2 Order. (mrp, )
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED that a copy of this order and the previous order (doc no 2) be re-sent to Plaintiff Eldon Wolfcale, who is located at 520 NW CO Rd 274, Fountain Florida 32438. Ordered that a copy of this order, the complaint (doc no 1) and the previous order (doc no 2) be sent to Charles Danielson, who is located at 7515 West Polk Avenue, Littleton, Colorado 80123. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 6/27/2019. (bjc, ) CMRR# 7017 2620 0001 1429 1104 Danielson, CMRR# 7017 2620 0001 1429 1111 Wolfcale
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFIED Mail Returned as Unclaimed. Mail sent to Edon Wolfcale. Doc# 2 order. (bjc, )
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDERED that within 20 days of the date of this Order, (1) Mr Danielson shall provide proof he is a licensed attorney and proceed to be admitted to practice before this court pursuant to Local Rule AT-1; (2) Plaintiff Wolfcale shall indicate his intent to proceed pro se and file an amended complaint; or (3) an attorney licensed to practice before this court shall file an amended complaint on Plaintiff Wolfcale's behalf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 6/24/2019. (bjc, ) cc: Wolfcale CMRR# 7017 2620 0001 1429 1159, Danielson CMRR# 7017 2620 0001 1429 1142
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn pursuant to GO 05-07 (aam, )
June 21, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number TXE100018786 (aam, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State of Texas, filed by Eldon Wolfcale. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aam, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolfcale v. State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eldon Wolfcale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?