Dennis v. Arlanxeo USA, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Charles Dennis
Defendant: Arlanxeo USA, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00309
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Arlanxeo USA, L.L.C.. (Kristiansen, Eric)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Charles Dennis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alfred, Byron)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arlanxeo USA, L.L.C., filed by Charles Dennis.(Alfred, Byron)
August 29, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2019 at 11:00 AM at Beaumont Courthouse in chambers before District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (jc, )
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference with a proposed Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 8/27/19. (mrp, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Arlanxeo USA, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Saudi Aramco for Arlanxeo USA, L.L.C.. (Kristiansen, Eric)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Arlanxeo USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kristiansen, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2019: #3 Revised Proposed Order) (tkd, ).
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Arlanxeo USA, LLC on 08/01/2019, filed by Charles Dennis. (Alfred, Byron)
July 23, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Arlanxeo USA, L.L.C. and emailed to Plaintiff's atty for service. (aam, )
July 22, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Charles Dennis. (aam, )
July 22, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (aam, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arlanxeo USA, L.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7359674.), filed by Charles Dennis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons(es))(Alfred, Byron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennis v. Arlanxeo USA, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlanxeo USA, L.L.C.
Represented By: Eric Walter Kristiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Dennis
Represented By: Byron Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?