Groupierre v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Doris Groupierre
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc and BP America Production Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00340
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Case Management Conference held on 10/3/2019. Attys present - Pltf: Nathan Nelson (via phone); Deft - Connell Hess. Court will enter scheduling order. (jmv, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Nathan Lee Nelson on behalf of Doris Groupierre. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7448919. (Nelson, Nathan)
September 19, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Case Management Conference RESET for 10/3/2019 10:00 AM in CHAMBERS, Room 221.(jmv, )
September 19, 2019 NOTICE the Case Management Conference scheduled on 9/19/19 at 10:00 am is CANCELLED. The hearing will be reset at a later date. (jmv, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lucier, Georgia)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorneys Thomas Wilson Taylor and Connell Chad Hess for BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production Inc. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 8/13/19. (mrp, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by BP Exploration & Production Inc identifying Corporate Parent BP PLC for BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Taylor, Thomas)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by BP America Production Company (Taylor, Thomas)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taylor, Thomas)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 Case Management Conference is set for 9/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 8/12/19. (mrp, )
August 6, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Doris Groupierre. (aam, )
August 6, 2019 The following attorneys were contacted via email on 8/6/2019 regarding admission requirements to The Eastern District of Texas: Plaintiff's attorneys Craig Downs and Nathan Lee Nelson; and Don Haycraft, Catherine McEldowney and Kevin Michael Hodges, attorneys for Defendants BP Exploration & Production, Inc and BP America Production Company. (aam, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00188. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the UnitedStates District Court for the Eastern District of Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/5/2019. (NEF: Sect J)(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/6/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/6/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than May 30, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than July 1, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 5/2/2019.(mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/6/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/6/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/6/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/6/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7354054) filed by Doris Groupierre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Election Not to Mediate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Craig Downs added to party Doris Groupierre(pty:pla).(Downs, Craig) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Groupierre v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier
Represented By: Connell Chad Hess
Represented By: Thomas Wilson Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier
Represented By: Connell Chad Hess
Represented By: Thomas Wilson Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Groupierre
Represented By: Nathan Lee Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?