Cooper v. Shreading et al
Plaintiff: Johnny Cooper
Defendant: Janet Ann Shreading and The Shreading Trust
Case Number: 1:2019cv00346
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Thad Heartfield
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wise, Warren)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2019 02:00 PM in Chambers before District Judge Thad Heartfield. (fal, )
August 9, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT IN CAUSE NO. B-203989 AND IS INCLUDEDD IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS EXHIBIT C***ORIGINAL PETITION against Janet Ann Shreading, The Shreading Trust, filed by Johnny Cooper.(aam, )
August 8, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Johnny Cooper. (aam, )
August 8, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Thad Heartfield. (aam, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's original petition by Janet Ann Shreading, The Shreading Trust. (Wise, Warren)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Janet Ann Shreading (Wise, Warren)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Janet Ann Shreading from 60th Judicial Court, case number B-203989. ( Filing fee $ 400 Receipt# TXE100019085), filed by Janet Ann Shreading. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Civil Cover Sheet #2 Exhibit B, Certified Copy State Court Docket Sheet #3 Exhibit C, Copies of Pleadings, Answers, Processes and Orders #4 Exhibit D, List of Parties #5 Exhibit E, List of Attorneys #6 Exhibit F, Record of Parties Requesting Trial by Jury #7 Exhibit G, Statement regarding Case Status)(Wise, Warren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Shreading et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Ann Shreading
Represented By: Warren Browning Wise
Represented By: Monica Lee Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Shreading Trust
Represented By: Warren Browning Wise
Represented By: Monica Lee Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Cooper
Represented By: Ronnie Turner, Jr
Represented By: Fabiana Mauricio Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?