The ITEX Group, LLC v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London subscribing to Cert. No. AMR-36993-03 et al
Plaintiff: The ITEX Group, LLC
Defendant: AmRisc, LLC, Princeton Excess and Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE and Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London subscribing to Cert. No. AMR-36993-03
Case Number: 1:2019cv00348
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Stay or Dismiss These Proceedings filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London subscribing to Cert. No. AMR-36993-03. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix Appendix documents)(Ferguson, Carter)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/1/2020 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 10/5/2020 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 10/2/19. (mrp, )
October 2, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Case Management Conference held on 10/2/2019. Attys Present - Pltf: Clint Brasher, Nishi Kothari; Deft: Carter Ferguson, Louis Williams. Trial will be set on 10/5/20. Court will enter scheduling order. (jmv, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Ann Justice on behalf of AmRisc, LLC (Justice, Jennifer)
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration by AmRisc, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Justice, Jennifer)
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Stay or Dismiss These Proceedings filed by The ITEX Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Brasher, Derek)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by AmRisc, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Justice, Jennifer)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London subscribing to Cert. No. AMR-36993-03. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix Appendix documents, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferguson, Carter)
September 19, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Case Management Conference RESET for 10/2/2019 10:30 AM in chambers, Room 221 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (jmv, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Stay or Dismiss These Proceedings. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Ferguson, Carter)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Stay or Dismiss These Proceedings by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London subscribing to Cert. No. AMR-36993-03. (Ferguson, Carter)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ferguson, Carter)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AmRisc, LLC (Shanes, Scott)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by The ITEX Group, LLC (Brasher, Derek)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London subscribing to Cert. No. AMR-36993-03 (Ferguson, Carter)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by The ITEX Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Brasher, Derek)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING CIVIL ACTIONS FOR RULE 16 MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 16 Case Management Conference is set for 9/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 8/16/19. (mrp, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London subscribing to Cert. No. AMR-36993-03 re #1 Notice of Removal,, Notice of Correction to Notice of Removal (Ferguson, Carter)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT IN CAUSE NUMBER D204023 AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS EXHIBIT A-4***ORIGINAL PETITION against All Defendants, filed by The ITEX Group, LLC.(aam, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London subscribing to Cert. No. AMR-36993-03 Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Parties (Attachments: #1 A)(Ferguson, Carter)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London subscribing to Cert. No. AMR-36993-03 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7386680), filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London subscribing to Cert. No. AMR-36993-03. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit A-1, List of Parties #8 Exhibit A-2 Civil cover sheet, #9 Exhibit A-3, Docket Sheet #10 Exhibit A-4, State Court filed documents #11 Exhibit A-5, List of Attorneys #12 Exhibit A-6, Record of Jury Demand and Name and Address of Court)(Ferguson, Carter).
August 12, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (aam, )
August 12, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by The ITEX Group, LLC. (aam, )
August 12, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The ITEX Group, LLC v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London subscribing to Cert. No. AMR-36993-03 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmRisc, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Nichols Wariner
Represented By: Scott Allen Shanes
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princeton Excess and Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Carter Len Ferguson,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: Carter Len Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona
Represented By: Carter Len Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Carter Len Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Carter Len Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Carter Len Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Company
Represented By: Carter Len Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Carter Len Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HDI Global Specialty SE
Represented By: Carter Len Ferguson,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London subscribing to Cert. No. AMR-36993-03
Represented By: Carter Len Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The ITEX Group, LLC
Represented By: Lance Paul Bradley
Represented By: Nishi Vimal Kothari
Represented By: Derek Clinton Brasher
Represented By: Joseph Azor Muckleroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?