Marsh v. Hartford Life Insurance Co et al
Plaintiff: Angel Marsh
Defendant: Valero Energy Corp and Hartford Life Insurance Co.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00351
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Angel Marsh Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Baum, Fabiana)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Docket Calla nd Final Pretrial Conference are set for 9/3/2020 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Discovery due by 6/15/2020. Jury Selection and Trial are set for 9/8/2020 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 10/1/19. (ljw, )
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Hartford Life Insurance Co. #8 is GRANTED. Hartford Life Insurance Co. is dismissed from this action without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 10/1/19. (ljw, )
October 1, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Case Management Conference held on 10/1/2019. Attorneys present: Pltf - Fabiana Baum, Deft - Michael Eaves. Court will enter scheduling order. (jmv, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Valero Energy Corp. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eaves, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2019: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (bjc, ).
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT Joint by Angel Marsh, Valero Energy Corp. (Eaves, Michael)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Valero Energy Corp.(Eaves, Michael)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT HARTFORD LIFE INSURANCE by Angel Marsh. (Baum, Fabiana)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Disclosure by Valero Energy Corp (Eaves, Michael)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended against All Defendants, filed by Angel Marsh.(Baum, Fabiana)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Hartford Life Insurance Co. Joint Notice of Pleading Deadlines (Dishman, Jodi)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anna Eman Imose on behalf of Hartford Life Insurance Co. (Imose, Anna)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jodi Warmbrod Dishman on behalf of Hartford Life Insurance Co. (Dishman, Jodi)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING CIVIL ACTIONS FOR RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 16 Case Management Conference is set for 10/1/2019 at 11:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 8/19/19. (mrp, )
August 13, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
August 13, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Angel Marsh. (aam, )
August 13, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (aam, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Valero Energy Corp. from 172nd Judicial District Court, Jefferson County, Texas, case number E-204,068. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7389903), filed by Valero Energy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #2 Exhibit CNA Policy, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Patricia Perez Goynes, #4 Exhibit All process, pleadings & orders received by Valero in State Court action, #5 Exhibit Certified copy of State Court Docket Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Valero Energy Corporation's List of Parties and Attorneys and Status of Case)(Eaves, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marsh v. Hartford Life Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Energy Corp
Represented By: Michael Keith Eaves
Represented By: Frank David Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Jodi Warmbrod Dishman
Represented By: Anna Eman Imose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Marsh
Represented By: Fabiana Mauricio Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?