In Re: Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc
Petitioner: Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00404
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Issued receipt #TXE100019410 for $1,000 surety payment submitted by Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc as directed by #3 Order (tkd, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Complaint and Petition for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability (tkd, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 Monition issued (tkd, )
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Approving Surety, Directing the Issuance of Monition, and Directing the Issuance of Notice to Potential Claims, granting #2 Motion. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 9/18/19 (rcvd by Clerk 9/23/19) (tkd, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Order Directing Issuance of Monition by Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Browning, Robert)
September 6, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (aam, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Parties ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7426328.), filed by Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Information Sheet)(Browning, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc
Represented By: Robert Myrick Browning, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?