Nugent v. Pioneer Energy Services Corp. et al
Plaintiff: William Nugent
Defendant: Pioneer Energy Services Corp. and Pioneer Well Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00407
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 CANCELLATION NOTICE: The scheduling conference set for 10/30/19 is cancelled. (jc, )
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Agreed Motion to Transfer Venue. This action is transferred to the US District Court for the Southern District of TX, Houston Division. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 10/18/19. (tkd, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 Agreed MOTION to Change Venue by Pioneer Energy Services Corp., Pioneer Well Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Collective Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Collective Action Complaint, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Barbour, Justin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2019: #4 Revised Proposed Order) (bjc, ).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference with a proposed Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 9/11/19. (mrp, )
September 11, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2019 at 11:30 AM in Beaumont Courthouse before District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (jc, )
September 10, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
September 9, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (aam, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pioneer Energy Services Corp., Pioneer Well Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Pioneer Production Services, Inc. for Pioneer Energy Services Corp., Pioneer Well Services, LLC. (Barbour, Justin)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pioneer Well Services, LLC, Pioneer Energy Services Corp. from 75th Judicial District Court, Liberty County, Texas, case number CV-1914574. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7427604), filed by Pioneer Well Services, LLC, Pioneer Energy Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-Plaintiff's Original Petition, #3 Exhibit 2-Defendant PES Summons and Service of Process from State Court Matter, #4 Exhibit 3-Plaintiff's 1st Amended Petition, #5 Exhibit 4-Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Petition, #6 Exhibit 5-Defendant PWS Summons and Service of Process from State Court, #7 Exhibit 6-Certified Copy of State's Civil Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit 7-Defendant PES's Original Answer and Defenses, #9 Exhibit 8-Defendant PES's First Amended Answer and Defenses to 2nd Amended Petition, #10 Exhibit 9- Defendant PWS's Answer & Defenses to 2nd Amended Petition, #11 Exhibit 10-State Court Notice of Removal, #12 Exhibit 11-List of Parties and Status of Removed Case, #13 Exhibit 12-List of Attorneys, #14 Exhibit 13-Record of which Parties have Requested a Trial by Jury, #15 Exhibit 14-Name and Address of Court From Which Case is Being Removrf)(Barbour, Justin.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nugent v. Pioneer Energy Services Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Energy Services Corp.
Represented By: Justin Barbour
Represented By: Dylan Alexander Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Well Services, LLC
Represented By: Justin Barbour
Represented By: Dylan Alexander Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Nugent
Represented By: Hugh Daniel Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?