Parrish v. United States of America
Plaintiff: dylan parrish
Defendant: U.S. Attorney UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00416
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dylan Parrish. United States of America served on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Chaffin, Robert)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Stephen Michael Ketyer on behalf of United States of America. (jmv, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2019: #1 Attachment) (jmv, ).
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States of America by serving The U.S. Attorney and The U.S. Attorney General, and emailed to Plaintiff's atty for service. (aam, )
September 10, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, )
September 10, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (bjc, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7430554.), filed by Dylan Parrish. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chaffin, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parrish v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: dylan parrish
Represented By: Robert A. Chaffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?