Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Ameriquest Mortgage Securities Inc v. King et al
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Ameriquest Mortgage Securities Inc
Defendant: Tanishia Lorane King and Darryl Harrison
Case Number: 1:2019cv00453
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Ameriquest Mortgage Securities Inc. Tanishia Lorane King served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (Cronenwett, Mark)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Ameriquest Mortgage Securities Inc. Darryl Harrison served on 10/5/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Cronenwett, Mark)
September 25, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Darryl Harrison, Tanishia Lorane King and emailed to plaintiff's atty for service. (aam, )
September 24, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (aam, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Ameriquest Mortgage Securities Inc (Cronenwett, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Darryl Harrison, Tanishia Lorane King ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7449571.), filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Ameriquest Mortgage Securities Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Ameriquest Mortgage Securities Inc v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Ameriquest Mortgage Securities Inc
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanishia Lorane King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?