Blevins et al v. Blank et al
Plaintiff: Shelley Blevins and Bryan O Blevins, Jr
Defendant: Michael Blank, Shelevia Raquel Proctor and State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00481
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued as to Michael Blank and emailed to plaintiffs' atty for service. (aam, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Initial Disclosures by Bryan O Blevins, Jr (Ramsey, Katherine)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Scheduling Order)(Fisher, David)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Shelevia Raquel Proctor.(Fisher, David)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 State Farm Lloyds ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Lloyds.(Fisher, David)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to conduct Rule 26(f) conference no later than November 13, 2019. Joint written report filed no later than November 25, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 10/24/2019. (bjc, )
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 10/16/2019. (bjc, )
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Michael J. Truncale recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 10/11/2019. (bjc, )
October 9, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
October 9, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Shelevia Raquel Proctor. (aam, )
October 9, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bryan O Blevins, Jr, Shelley Blevins. (aam, )
October 9, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (aam, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Shelevia Raquel Proctor from 172ND, case number E-204355. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7471648), filed by Shelevia Raquel Proctor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, Certified copy of state court docket sheet #3 Exhibit B, Index, Orig Petition and copies of pleadings, answers, processes and orders #4 Exhibit C, List of Parties and counsel #5 Exhibit D, Record of parties requesting trial by jury #6 Exhibit E, Statement regarding case status)(Fisher, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blevins et al v. Blank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Blank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelevia Raquel Proctor
Represented By: David Jefferson Fisher
Represented By: Stephanie Donean Surratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Blevins
Represented By: Randal Girard Cashiola
Represented By: Michael R Ramsey
Represented By: Katherine DeEtte Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan O Blevins, Jr
Represented By: Randal Girard Cashiola
Represented By: Michael R Ramsey
Represented By: Katherine DeEtte Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?