Harris v. GMAC Mortgage LLC et al
Plaintiff: Deborah . Harris and Deborah Harris
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Wells Fargo Bank N.A, Ditech Financial LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, LLC, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, GMAC Mortgage Investments, Inc. and GMAC Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00484
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Disclosure by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank N.A (Curran, Charles) Modified on 11/12/2019 (tkd, ).
November 12, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Case Management Conference RESET for 1/24/2020 10:00 AM IN CHAMBERS (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (jmv, ) Modified on 11/12/2019 (jmv, ).
October 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, LLC [DEFENDANTS' RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS] (Curran, Charles)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SETTING CIVIL ACTION FOR RULE 16 MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference must be held on or before November 1, 2019. The case is SET for a Rule 16 Case Management Conference on November 18, 2019 at 11:30 a.m., in Suite 221, Jack Brooks Federal Building, 300 Willow Street, Beaumont, Texas. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 10/11/19. (ljw, )
October 10, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
October 9, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (aam, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT IN CAUSE NO. B-204392 AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS EXHIBIT 1***ORIGINAL PETITION against All Defendants, filed by Deborah Harris.(aam, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. from 60th Judicial District Court of Jefferson County, Texas, case number B-204392. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7472684), filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Notice of Removal)(Hakari, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. GMAC Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Brandon Hakari
Represented By: Cole David Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Charles Royal Curran
Represented By: James Garth Fennegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A
Represented By: Charles Royal Curran
Represented By: James Garth Fennegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Charles Royal Curran
Represented By: James Garth Fennegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Robert Brandon Hakari
Represented By: Cole David Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah . Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Harris
Represented By: Christopher Dee Leavins
Represented By: Christy Amuny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?