Henson et al v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Debra henson and Brianna Henson
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00573
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Brianna Henson, Debra Henson (Tracy, E)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Proposed Scheduling Order Deadlines)(Jones, Ryan)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by FCA US LLC Initial Disclosures (Huntsman, Fred)
December 17, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Management Conference RESET for 1/17/2020 10:00 AM in Ctrm 5 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (jmv, ) Modified on 12/17/2019 (jmv, ).
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Civil Action for Rule 16 Management Conference for 1/16/2020 at 11:00 AM in Ctrm 5 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 12/04/2019. (bmf, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by FCA US LLC.(Huntsman, Fred)
December 4, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (tkd, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Debra Henson, Brianna Henson. FCA US LLC served on 11/13/2019. (Tracy, E)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** NOTICE by Brianna Henson, Debra Henson (Tracy, E) Modified on 11/14/2019 (bjc, ).
November 14, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 3, Return of Service. Incorrect event used. PLEASE IGNORE. Attorney will re-file.*** (bjc, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to FCA US LLC and emailed to Plaintiffs' atty for process of service. (aam, )
November 12, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
November 11, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (aam, )
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7517194.), filed by Debra henson, Brianna Henson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tracy, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henson et al v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Fred Clayton Huntsman
Represented By: Ryan Scott Jones
Represented By: Kurt Christopher Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra henson
Represented By: E Todd Tracy
Represented By: Wendell Phillip Martens, Jr
Represented By: Andrew Galen Counts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna Henson
Represented By: E Todd Tracy
Represented By: Wendell Phillip Martens, Jr
Represented By: Andrew Galen Counts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?