Thorco Projects A/S v. M/V BBC RAISE (ex M/V THORCO RAFFLES), IMO 9538880, her engines, apparel, furniture, equipment, appurtenances, tackle, etc., in rem
Plaintiff: Thorco Projects A/S
Defendant: M/V BBC RAISE (ex M/V THORCO RAFFLES), IMO 9538880, her engines, apparel, furniture, equipment, appurtenances, tackle, etc., in rem
Claimant: Radiant Shipping Corp. Limited
Case Number: 1:2019cv00576
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Referring Judge: Keith F Giblin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Radiant Shipping Corp. Limited.(Bailey, James)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service of monition - seizure - release executed by US Marshal on 11/15/2019 (tkd, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Radiant Shipping Corp. Limited Statement of Right or Interest (Bailey, James)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 Seizure WARRANT Returned Executed by US Marshal on 11/13/2019 (tkd, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 Ex Parte MOTION to Deposit Funds Into Registry of Court by Thorco Projects A/S. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Letourneau, Keith) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2019: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (tkd, ).
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Thorco Projects A/S of Consent to Release Vessel from Rule C Arrest (Letourneau, Keith)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 WARRANT for Arrest of Vessell issued (ttp, )
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin to conduct all pretrial proceedings, recommend disposition on dispositive matters and determine non-dispositive matters. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 11/13/19. (tkd, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Thorco Projects A/S. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Ex Parte Order, #2 Exhibit Warrant for Arrest of Vessel)(Letourneau, Keith)
November 13, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (aam, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Original Verified Complaint against M/V BBC RAISE (ex M/V THORCO RAFFLES), IMO 9538880, her engines, apparel, furniture, equipment, appurtenances, tackle, etc., in rem ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7522410.), filed by Thorco Projects A/S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Letourneau, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thorco Projects A/S v. M/V BBC RAISE (ex M/V THORCO RAFFLES), IMO 9538880, her engines, apparel, furniture, equipment, appurtenances, tackle, etc., in rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V BBC RAISE (ex M/V THORCO RAFFLES), IMO 9538880, her engines, apparel, furniture, equipment, appurtenances, tackle, etc., in rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thorco Projects A/S
Represented By: Keith B Letourneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Radiant Shipping Corp. Limited
Represented By: Robert L Klawetter
Represented By: James Terry Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?