Talley v. Southeast Regional VA-Director et al
Plaintiff: Leatrice Talley
Defendant: Southeast Regional VA - Director and Southeast Regional VA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00619
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith F Giblin
Referring Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Southeast Regional VA and delivered to USM for service. (fal, )
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing service of process. The Clerk of Court shall issue blank summons to the Plaintiff and Plaintiff shall prepare summons and return them to the Clerk within 15 days of receipt. Copy of order and blank summons mailed to plaintiff on 1/23/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 1/22/20. (mrp, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge by Leatrice Talley. (mrp, )
December 10, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge.Sent via US Mail (aam, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Leatrice Talley. (aam, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin pursuant to GO 05-07 (aam, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Southeast Regional VA Travel Department and Administration, and Southeast Regional VA - Director, filed by Leatrice Talley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aam, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talley v. Southeast Regional VA-Director et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leatrice Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeast Regional VA - Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeast Regional VA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?