Douglas v. Invista S.A.R.L. et al
Plaintiff: Lannie Douglas
Defendant: Invista S.A.R.L. and Travis Brown
Case Number: 1:2020cv00318
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Rule 16 Mgmt Conference: Attorney Conference should be held on or before 9/23/20. Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2020 10:30 AM before District Judge Michael J. Truncale via telephone conf. Dial-in instructions for the call are as follows: Dial-In #: 877-336-1839, Access Code/Pass Code: 3061359#. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 9/3/20. (jmv, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Travis Brown, Invista S.A.R.L. (Quezada, Stephen)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant INVISTA S.a.r.l.'s Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Invista S.A.R.L..(Quezada, Stephen)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant Travis Brown's Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Travis Brown.(Quezada, Stephen)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lannie Douglas. Travis Brown served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Hunnicutt, James)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lannie Douglas. Invista S.A.R.L. served on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (Hunnicutt, James)
July 23, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (bmf, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Travis Brown. (bmf, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Invista S.A.R.I.. (bmf, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Travis Brown, Invista S.A.R.L. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7907579.), filed by Lannie Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spencer, Jennifer) Modified Defendant's correct spelling of name on 7/23/2020 (bmf, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douglas v. Invista S.A.R.L. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invista S.A.R.L.
Represented By: Stephen Jose Quezada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Brown
Represented By: Stephen Jose Quezada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lannie Douglas
Represented By: Jennifer Jackson Spencer
Represented By: James Edward Hunnicutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?