Cardenas v. Warden USP Beaumont
Petitioner: Julio Cesar Cardenas
Respondent: Warden USP Beaumont
Case Number: 1:2020cv00326
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Referring Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER from Julio Cardenas (mailed Gen Ord 15-13 and requested docket sheet) (tkd, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Serve Defendants Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 4 by Julio Cesar Cardenas. (bmf, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION informing that medical issue is getting worse by Julio Cesar Cardenas. (bjc, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to the court from the US Department of Justice regarding service on Warden Shults. (bjc, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Production of Affidavits from Medical and Unit Team Staff by Julio Cesar Cardenas. (tkd, )
August 3, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn pursuant to a Standing Order (tkd, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 USC 2241 (Filing fee $5.00 receipt #TXE100020672), filed by Julio Cesar Cardenas.(tkd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardenas v. Warden USP Beaumont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden USP Beaumont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Julio Cesar Cardenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?