Simmons v. Officer N. Nobles et al
Plaintiff: Tommy Lee Simmons
Respondent: Secretary Coleman and Officer N. Nobles
Case Number: 1:2020cv00332
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Referring Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (ljw, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:20-cv-02370. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 4, 2020 Interdistrict transfer to Eastern District of Texas, Beaumont Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 08/04/2020., filed. (jengonzalez, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/4/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Eastern District of Texas, Beaumont Division. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/4/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM ON TRANSFER (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/4/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Tommy Simmons, filed. (gkelner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/4/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by Tommy Lee Simmons, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(EdnitaPonce, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/4/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (bgoolsby, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/4/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 EXHIBITS by Tommy Lee Simmons, filed.(bgoolsby, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/4/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Facts filed by Tommy Lee Simmons. (bgoolsby, 4) Modified on 7/6/2020 (bgoolsby, 4). (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/8/2020) (ckrus, 4). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/4/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Officer N. Nobles, Secretary Coleman (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Tommy Lee Simmons.(bgoolsby, 4) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/8/2020) (ckrus, 4). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/4/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Officer N. Nobles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Officer N. Nobles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Lee Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?