Alvarez v. TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Edwing Ahmed Alvarez
Respondent: Director TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 1:2020cv00357
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Beaumont Office
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Referring Judge: Keith F Giblin
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Edwing Ahmed Alvarez on 9/14/2020 re #5 Report and Recommendations,. (bjc, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Edwing Ahmed Alvarez. Petitioners motion to proceed in forma pauperis should be denied. Petitioner should be allowed thirty days to submit a filing fee of $5. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 9/9/20. (ljw, )
August 25, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. (ljw, )
August 25, 2020 Case transferred in from Lufkin Division on 08/24/2020 Case Number 9:20-cv-177. Case assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone.(ljw, )
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER. The Clerk will TRANSFER this action to the Clerk of the Beaumont Division of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 8/24/20. (ljw, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION REGARDING TRANSFER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 8/24/20. (ljw, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Edwing Ahmed Alvarez. (bmf, )
August 17, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Keith Giblin. (bmf, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Edwing Ahmed Alvarez.(bmf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez v. TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edwing Ahmed Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?