Pryor v. Warden, FCI Beaumont Low
Petitioner: William R. Pryor
Respondent: Warden F. J. Garrido and Warden, FCI Beaumont Low
Case Number: 1:2020cv00434
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Referring Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Filing 8 OBJECTIONS to #3 Report and Recommendation by William R. Pryor. (tkd, )
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner's objections to the Report and Recommendation are due by 12/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 11/18/20. (tkd, )
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to #3 Report and Recommendations by William R. Pryor. (kcv, )
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by William R. Pryor on 11/4/2020 as to #2 Order. (kcv, )
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by William R. Pryor on 11/4/2020 as to #3 Report and Recommendations. (kcv, )
November 4, 2020 Filing fee for Habeas: $ 5.00, receipt number TXE100020868 (saw, )
October 28, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by William R. Pryor should be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 10/28/2020. (ttp, )
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REGARDING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS - It is ORDERED that petitioner shall, within twenty (20) days from the date set forth below, submit the filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by astatement prepared by an authorized prison official showing the average balance and average deposits to petitioners inmate trust account for the preceding six months. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 10/28/2020. (ttp, )
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for 2241 Relief filed by William R Pryor.(kcv, )
October 26, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (kcv, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pryor v. Warden, FCI Beaumont Low
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William R. Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden F. J. Garrido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, FCI Beaumont Low
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?