Parker v. United States of America
Plaintiff: RAFAEL PARKER
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00444
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Referring Judge: Keith F Giblin
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by United States of America.(Parker, Andrea)
December 28, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Zina Makar on behalf of Rafael Parker. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8170328. (Makar, Zina)
December 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Marissa K Hatton on behalf of Rafael Parker. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8166246. (Hatton, Marissa)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO ANSWER. Deft is ordered to answer by 1/4/2021. The deadline to conduct a Rule 26(f) conference is terminated pending deft's responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 12/14/20. (tkd, )
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to conduct Rule 26(f) conference by 12/7/2020 and file a joint written report by 12/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 11/19/20. (tkd, )
November 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Aderson Francois on behalf of Rafael Parker. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8113320. (Francois, Aderson)
November 10, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Hedrick Parker on behalf of United States of America (Parker, Andrea)
November 2, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by RAFAEL PARKER. (bjc, )
November 2, 2020 The following attorneys were emailed on 11/2/2020 regarding admission requirements to the Eastern District of Texas: Plaintiff's attorney: Aderson Francois. Defendant's attorneys: Daniel Schaefer and Michelle Jackson. (bjc, )
November 2, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. (bjc, )
November 2, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (bjc, )
November 2, 2020 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:20-cv-00430. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Defendant's motion to transfer venue #7 is hereby GRANTED, and it is ORDERED that this action be TRANSFERRED to the District Court for the Eastern District of Texas. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/21/2020. (lcabj2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/2/2020.]
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay. It is ORDERED that the government's obligation to respond to the complaint is STAYED pending resolution of the motion to transfer. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/08/2020. (lcabj2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/2/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to opposition to motion re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Stay filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Schaefer, Daniel) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/2/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 9 Memorandum in opposition to re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Stay filed by RAFAEL PARKER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Francois, Aderson) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/2/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Substituting for attorney Michelle D. Jackson (Schaefer, Daniel) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/2/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Case, MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, Michelle). Added MOTION to Stay on 4/20/2020 (zjf). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/2/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/24/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Francois, Aderson) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/2/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General February 24, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Francois, Aderson) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/2/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/2/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/2/2020.]
February 16, 2020 Filing 3 ERRATA Corrected Caption by RAFAEL PARKER. (Francois, Aderson) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/2/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by RAFAEL PARKER.(Francois, Aderson) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/2/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6829289) filed by Rafael Parker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Francois, Aderson) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/2/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAFAEL PARKER
Represented By: Aderson Francois
Represented By: Marissa K Hatton
Represented By: Zina Makar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Andrea Hedrick Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?