Taylor v. Warden, USP Beaumont
Petitioner: Griffin Michael Taylor
Respondent: Warden, USP Beaumont
Case Number: 1:2020cv00547
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith F Giblin
Referring Judge: Thad Heartfield
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to the court re relevant conduct by Griffin Michael Taylor. (kcv, )
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by AUSA Mike Lockhart (signed by Myoshi Price) on 1/13/2021 as to #2 Order to Show Cause - Federal Habeas Petition. (kcv, )
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - FEDERAL HABEAS PETITION. Respondent to file response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. It is ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall issue process and the respondent shall have sixty (60) days from the date of service of process to answer the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus in full compliance with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2255 Cases in the United States District Courts, and show cause why relief prayed for should not be granted. Petitioner is permitted to proceed in this cause without prepayment of fees of costs of security therefor until further order of this court. Copy of order mailed to U.S. Attorneys Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 1/11/2021. (kcv, )
December 21, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number TXE100020936 (tkd, )
December 18, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. (kcv, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 28:2241 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Griffin Michael Taylor.(kcv, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Warden, USP Beaumont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Griffin Michael Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, USP Beaumont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?