Vega v. Arendal S. de R.L. de C.V., et al
Plaintiff: Juan Vega
Defendant: Arendal S. de R.L. de C.V., Cal Dive International, Inc., Marine Management Services, Inc. and Crowley Technical Management Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00069
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Wray, Michael) Modified on 3/24/2021 (kcv, ).
February 22, 2021 Filing 8 Defendants Crowley Technical Management, Inc. and Marine Management Services, Inc. ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Crowley Technical Management Inc., Marine Management Services, Inc..(Wray, Michael)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO CONDUCT RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE. The court directs the parties to confer as required by FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) by March 19, 2021. In addition to a discussion of the items set forth in Rule 26(f), the parties shall attempt in good faith to agree on certain matters, including deadlines for a proposed Scheduling Order, and shall file with the court a joint written report outlining their proposals no later than April 2, 2021. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 2/19/2021. (kcv, )
February 19, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 4/20/2021 at 3:00 PM in Ctrm 3 (Beaumont) before District Judge Marcia A. Crone. Counsel must appear in person.(jc, )
February 18, 2021 Filing 7 THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION filed 1/19/2021 in State Court against Arendal S. de R.L. de C.V., Cal Dive International, Inc., Crowley Technical Management Inc., Marine Management Services, Inc., filed by Juan Vega.(kcv, )
February 18, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER filed in State Court to Third Amended Complaint by Crowley Technical Management Inc.(kcv, )
February 18, 2021 Filing 5 THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION filed 11/6/2019 in State Court against Arendal S. de R.L. de C.V., Cal Dive International, Inc., Crowley Technical Management Inc., filed by Juan Vega.(kcv, ) Modified date filed on 2/19/2021 (kcv, ).
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Arendal S. de R.L. de C.V., Cal Dive International, Inc., and Crowley Technical Management Inc., filed by Juan Vega.(kcv, )
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Arendal S. de R.L. de C.V., filed by Juan Vega.(kcv, ) Modified title on 2/19/2021 (kcv, ).
February 18, 2021 Filing 2 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Arendal S. de R.L. de C.V., filed by Juan Vega.(kcv, ) Modified title on 2/19/2021 (kcv, ).
February 18, 2021 Case Assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (kcv, )
February 18, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (kcv, )
February 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Marine Management Services, Inc., Crowley Technical Management Inc. from Jefferson, case number A-0203194. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8252838), filed by Marine Management Services, Inc., Crowley Technical Management Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Wray, Michael) Modified Exhibit description on 2/19/2021 (kcv, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vega v. Arendal S. de R.L. de C.V., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arendal S. de R.L. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal Dive International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marine Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael John Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crowley Technical Management Inc.
Represented By: Michael John Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Vega
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Kirchmer
Represented By: Joseph J Fisher, II
Represented By: Fabiana Mauricio Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?