Boudreaux et al v. State of Texas
Plaintiff: Esteban Lopez, Autumn Minton, Porter May, Rodney Badon, Brandon Sanders, Cindy Perez, Candace Abshier, Cat 5 Resources LLC, Richard Belsey, Sharon Clubb, Myra Wellons, Cecile Jimenez, William Olivier, Scott Hamric, Janet Dancer, Devon Boudreaux, Bryan Mills, Bruce & Tina Hinds, Billy Stanley, Sean Fillyaw, Jerry Stepan and Charlie Carter
Defendant: THE STATE OF TEXAS and State of Texas
Case Number: 1:2021cv00154
Filed: April 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Case transferred from Texas Eastern has been opened in Southern District of Texas as case 4:21cv1521, filed 5/7/2021. (bjc, )
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue. This action is transferred to the US District Court for the Southern District of TX. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 4/26/21. (tkd, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue by Candace Abshier, Rodney Badon, Richard Belsey, Devon Boudreaux, Charlie Carter, Cat 5 Resources LLC, Sharon Clubb, Janet Dancer, Sean Fillyaw, Scott Hamric, Bruce & Tina Hinds, Cecile Jimenez, Esteban Lopez, Porter May, Bryan Mills, Autumn Minton, William Olivier, Cindy Perez, Brandon Sanders, Billy Stanley, Jerry Stepan, Myra Wellons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Vincent, E) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/20/2021: #3 Proposed Order) (tkd, ).
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the parties to conduct a Rule 26(f) Conference by 4/29/2021. Rule 16 Case Management/Scheduling Conference via telephone set for 5/25/2021 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 4/12/21. (tkd, )
April 8, 2021 The following attorneys were contacted by email on 4/8/2021 regarding admission requirements for the Eastern District of TX: Mary Conner and Lawrence Dunbar for plaintiffs (tkd, )
April 8, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (tkd, )
April 8, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (tkd, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 5 ORIGINAL ANSWER (filed in state court) to #2 Original Petition, by State of Texas.(tkd, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 SECOND AMENDED PETITION (filed in state court) against State of Texas, filed by Esteban Lopez, Bryan Mills, Cecile Jimenez, Richard Belsey, Rodney Badon, Cat 5 Resources LLC, Devon Boudreaux, Charlie Carter, Brandon Sanders, Candace Abshier, Cindy Perez, Sharon Clubb, Bruce & Tina Hinds, Billy Stanley, Jerry Stepan, Sean Fillyaw, Autumn Minton, Scott Hamric, Janet Dancer, Myra Wellons, William Olivier, Porter May.(tkd, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 3 FIRST AMENDED PETITION (filed in state court) against State of Texas, filed by Esteban Lopez, Bryan Mills, Cecile Jimenez, Richard Belsey, Rodney Badon, Cat 5 Resources LLC, Devon Boudreaux, Charlie Carter, Brandon Sanders, Candace Abshier, Cindy Perez, Sharon Clubb, Bruce & Tina Hinds, Billy Stanley, Jerry Stepan, Sean Fillyaw, Autumn Minton, Scott Hamric, Janet Dancer, Myra Wellons, William Olivier, Porter May.(tkd, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 2 ORIGINAL PETITION (filed in state court) against State of Texas, filed by Esteban Lopez, Bryan Mills, Cecile Jimenez, Richard Belsey, Rodney Badon, Cat 5 Resources LLC, Devon Boudreaux, Charlie Carter, Brandon Sanders, Candace Abshier, Cindy Perez, Sharon Clubb, Bruce & Tina Hinds, Billy Stanley, Jerry Stepan, Sean Fillyaw, Autumn Minton, Scott Hamric, Janet Dancer, Myra Wellons, William Olivier, Porter May.(tkd, )
April 7, 2021 Filing fee received via Pay.gov: $402, receipt number 0540-8343580 (tkd, )
April 7, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by State of Texas. (tkd, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State of Texas from 172nd Judicial District Court of Jefferson County, Texas, case number E-207211., filed by State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Index of Documents, #3 List of Counsel)(Azeredo, Glorieni "Glori") (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened image on 4/8/2021) (tkd, ). Modified on 4/8/2021 (tkd, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boudreaux et al v. State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esteban Lopez
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autumn Minton
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Porter May
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Badon
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Sanders
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Perez
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Abshier
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cat 5 Resources LLC
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Belsey
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Clubb
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myra Wellons
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecile Jimenez
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Olivier
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Hamric
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Dancer
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Boudreaux
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Mills
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce & Tina Hinds
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Stanley
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Fillyaw
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Stepan
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Carter
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE STATE OF TEXAS
Represented By: Glorieni "Glori Marie Azeredo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Texas
Represented By: Glorieni "Glori Marie Azeredo
Represented By: Lisa McClain Mitchell
Represented By: Esteban Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?