Southeast Texas Olive, LLC et al v. State of Texas
Plaintiff: Joan Jeffrey, Gulf Coast Olive Investments, LLC, Southeast Texas Olive, LLC, Randy & Monica Brazil and Herbert & Kerry Dillard
Defendant: THE STATE OF TEXAS and State of Texas
Case Number: 1:2021cv00155
Filed: April 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of transfer to the Southern District of Texas case no. 3:21-cv-104, received 5/10/2021. (kcv, )
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue. This action is transferred to the US District Court for the Southern District of TX. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 4/26/21. (tkd, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue by Randy & Monica Brazil, Herbert & Kerry Dillard, Gulf Coast Olive Investments, LLC, Joan Jeffrey, Southeast Texas Olive, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Vincent, E) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/20/2021: #4 Revised Proposed Order) (tkd, ).
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the parties to conduct a Rule 26(f) conference by 4/29/2021. Rule 16 Case Management/Scheduling Conference set via telephone for 5/25/2021 at 2:30 PM in Beaumont Courthouse before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 4/12/21. (tkd, )
April 8, 2021 The following attorneys were contacted by email on 4/8/2021 regarding admission requirements for the Eastern District of TX: Mary Conner and Lawrence Dunbar for plaintiffs (tkd, )
April 8, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (tkd, )
April 8, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (tkd, )
April 8, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number TXE100021035 (tkd, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 5 ORIGINAL ANSWER (filed in state court) to #2 Original Petition, by State of Texas.(tkd, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 SECOND AMENDED PETITION (filed in state court) against State of Texas, filed by Southeast Texas Olive, LLC, Herbert & Kerry Dillard, Randy & Monica Brazil, Joan Jeffrey, Gulf Coast Olive Investments, LLC.(tkd, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 3 FIRST AMENDED PETITION (filed in state court) against State of Texas, filed by Southeast Texas Olive, LLC, Herbert & Kerry Dillard, Randy & Monica Brazil, Joan Jeffrey, Gulf Coast Olive Investments, LLC.(tkd, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 2 ORIGINAL PETITION (filed in state court) against State of Texas, filed by Southeast Texas Olive, LLC, Herbert & Kerry Dillard, Randy & Monica Brazil, Joan Jeffrey, Gulf Coast Olive Investments, LLC.(tkd, )
April 7, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by State of Texas. (tkd, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State of Texas from 253rd Judicial District Court of Liberty County, Texas, case number 21DC-CV-00071., filed by State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Index of Documents, #3 List of Counsel)(Azeredo, Glorieni "Glori") Modified on 4/8/2021 (tkd, ). (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened image on 4/8/2021) (tkd, ). Modified on 4/8/2021 (tkd, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southeast Texas Olive, LLC et al v. State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Jeffrey
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gulf Coast Olive Investments, LLC
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southeast Texas Olive, LLC
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy & Monica Brazil
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert & Kerry Dillard
Represented By: E Lawrence Vincent
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Charles William Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE STATE OF TEXAS
Represented By: Glorieni "Glori Marie Azeredo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Texas
Represented By: Glorieni "Glori Marie Azeredo
Represented By: Lisa McClain Mitchell
Represented By: Esteban Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?